United States | United Kingdom | Republican Party (United States) | Democratic Party (United States) | United States House of Representatives | President of the United States | United Nations | United States Senate | United States Navy | United States Army | Supreme Court of the United States | United States Air Force | Native Americans in the United States | United States Congress | Parliament of the United Kingdom | Australian Labor Party | Whig | 66th United States Congress | Prime Minister of the United Kingdom | Democratic Party | 74th United States Congress | 18th United States Congress | 73rd United States Congress | 54th United States Congress | 61st United States Congress | United States Marine Corps | United States Department of Defense | 64th United States Congress | 65th United States Congress | 53rd United States Congress |
He did not cite, but presumably was responding to, the appearance of his first competition, the Chicago's American (sponsored by a rival political party, the Whigs).
He ran again as a Whig in 1832 and served in the 23rd through the 28th Congresses (March 4, 1833 – March 3, 1845), becoming chairman of the Agriculture Committee.
In 1840, he ran for Mayor of Buffalo, New York, but was defeated by the Whig candidate Sheldon Thompson in a close race: 1135 for Thompson, 1125 for Barker.
As a Whig, he was elected to the 33rd United States Congress in 1852 and served one two-year term (March 4, 1853 - March 3, 1855), declining a renomination in 1854.
He was elected as a Whig to the 28th, 29th and 30th United States Congresses, and served from March 4, 1843, to March 3, 1849.
He was elected as a Whig to the 27th United States Congress in 1840, and served a single term before declining re-election.