He was an unsuccessful candidate for reelection in 1958 to the Eighty-sixth Congress and for election in 1960 to the Eighty-seventh Congress, after which he returned to the practice of law.
He was an unsuccessful candidate for election in 1958 to the Eighty-sixth Congress and an unsuccessful candidate for nomination for the United States Senate in 1960.
The Antarctica Service Medal (ASM) was established by the United States Congress on July 7, 1960 under Public Law 600 of the 86th Congress.
May was elected as a Republican to the Eighty-sixth and to the five succeeding Congresses (January 3, 1959–January 3, 1971).
She was an unsuccessful candidate for reelection to the Eighty-sixth Congress in 1958.
He was an unsuccessful candidate for reelection in 1958 to the Eighty-sixth Congress.
He was an unsuccessful candidate for reelection to the Eighty-sixth Congress in 1958.
Hoffman was elected as a Republican to the Eighty-sixth and to the two succeeding Congresses (January 3, 1959-January 3, 1965).
He was an unsuccessful candidate for reelection in 1958 to the Eighty-sixth Congress, largely due to his request for a vote for appropriations to continue construction on the controversial and wildly unpopular Tuttle Creek Dam along the Big Blue River.
He was an unsuccessful candidate for reelection in 1958 to the Eighty-sixth Congress and for election in 1960 to the Eighty-seventh Congress.
He was renominated for the Eighty-sixth Congress but later withdrew because of ill health, and resumed the practice of law.
Shipley was elected as a Democrat to the Eighty-sixth and to the nine succeeding Congresses (January 3, 1959-January 3, 1979).
He was not a candidate for reelection in 1958 to the Eighty-sixth Congress.
He was elected as a Republican to the 86th United States Congress, by special election, to fill the vacancy caused by the death of United States Representative Alvin Bush, and was reelected to the eight succeeding Congresses.
Roush was elected as a Democrat to the Eighty-sixth and to the four succeeding Congresses (January 3, 1959 – January 3, 1969).
He elected as a Republican to the Eighty-sixth Congress, originally by special election to fill the vacancy caused by the death of United States Representative Doug Elliott, and reelected to the five succeeding Congresses.
He was elected as a Democrat to the Eighty-sixth Congress to fill the vacancy caused by the resignation of Isidore Dollinger.
He was an unsuccessful candidate for reelection in 1958 to the Eighty-sixth Congress, for election in 1960 to the Eighty-seventh Congress, and in 1970 to the Ninety-second Congress.
Coffee would also run losing races in 1950 for the Eighty-second Congress and in 1958 to the Eighty-sixth Congress.
In 1958 he was elected to the Eighty-sixth United States Congress serving from January 3, 1959 to January 3, 1961, and failed in his bid to be reelected in 1960.
-- A grammar fix may be needed here. -->Had been renominated to the Eighty-sixth Congress.
He was elected as a Democrat to the Eighty-sixth Congress (January 3, 1959 – January 3, 1961), defeating the Republican candidate, former Governor Harold Arthur.
He was not a candidate for renomination in 1958 to the Eighty-sixth Congress.
United States | United Kingdom | Republican Party (United States) | Democratic Party (United States) | United States House of Representatives | President of the United States | United Nations | United States Senate | United States Navy | United States Army | Supreme Court of the United States | United States Air Force | Native Americans in the United States | United States Congress | Parliament of the United Kingdom | 66th United States Congress | Prime Minister of the United Kingdom | 74th United States Congress | 18th United States Congress | 73rd United States Congress | 54th United States Congress | 61st United States Congress | United States Marine Corps | United States Department of Defense | 64th United States Congress | 65th United States Congress | 53rd United States Congress | 52nd United States Congress | 55th United States Congress | United States Army Corps of Engineers |